This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 10/17/2020 at 08:32:18 (UTC).

JJM PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC VS ALPHA AND OMEGA BOATS Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 JJM PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ALPHA AND OMEGA BOATS. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FIRMANI, PAUL EDWIN and FIRMANI, PAUL E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FIRMANI, PAUL EDWIN

FIRMANI, PAUL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JJM PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC

Defendants

SUPPLICE, KERVEN

CALCANO, ANGEL

ALPHA AND OMEGA BOATS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PALMA, ALEXIS MARIE

 

Court Documents

Summons to be Issued by Clerk UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

09/17/2020:Summons to be Issued by Clerk UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

Summons to be Issued by Clerk UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

09/17/2020:Summons to be Issued by Clerk UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

Exhibit

09/17/2020:Exhibit

Exhibit LEASE AGREEMENT

09/17/2020:Exhibit LEASE AGREEMENT

Complaint for Eviction

09/17/2020:Complaint for Eviction

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketDefault Entered ALPHA & OMEGA BOATS, KERVEN SUPPLICE, AND ANGEL CALCANO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketMotion For Default On AGAINST KERVEN SUPPLICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketMotion For Default On AGAINST ANGEL CALCANO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketMotion For Default On AGAINST ALPHA & OMEGA BOATS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketAffidavit Of Non Military Service KERVEN SUPPLICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketAffidavit Of Non Military Service ANGEL CALCANO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketAffidavit Of Non Military Service ALPHA & OMEGA BOATS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served (IND) KERVEN SUPPLICE 093020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served (IND) ANGEL CALCANO 092420

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served ALPHA & OMEGA BOATS 092420

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY FOR ANGEL CALCANO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY FOR ALPHA & OMEGA BOATS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk UNSIGNED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit LEASE AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint for Eviction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCase 512020CC002486CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 9/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less