This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 10/18/2020 at 06:02:54 (UTC).

JENNEX, CHRISTINA VS CARROLLS LLC

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 JENNEX, CHRISTINA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CARROLLS LLC. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BARTHLE, SUSAN G and BARTHLE, SUSAN GARDNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Pasco County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BARTHLE, SUSAN G

BARTHLE, SUSAN GARDNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JENNEX, CHRISTINA

Defendant

CARROLLS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURCHINS, KIMBERLY ANN

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY FOR CARROLL'S LLC

09/21/2020:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY FOR CARROLL'S LLC

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

09/18/2020:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketAffidavit Service Of SUMMONS SERVED ON CARROLLS LLC 100920

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY FOR CARROLL'S LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketFile Verified To This Point CFG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketRequest For Admissions CARROLLS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketRequest To Produce CARROLLS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNotice Of Serving Interrogatories CARROLLS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketNotice Designating Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCase 512020CA002119CAAXES Filed with Clerk on 9/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less