This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 03/22/2019 at 06:01:18 (UTC).

JENKINS, EVAN Et Al VS CENTRAL FLORIDA TRANSPORT LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/15/2019 JENKINS, EVAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CENTRAL FLORIDA TRANSPORT LLC. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BARTHLE, SUSAN G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Pasco County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BARTHLE, SUSAN G

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JENKINS, EVAN

POST, PAULA

Defendants

CENTRAL FLORIDA TRANSPORT LLC

MARTINEZ, LISDANY GONZALEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREIWE, DONALD CHRISTOPHER PATRICK

 

Court Documents

Notice Of Service FILED BY PLTFS

04/03/2019:Notice Of Service FILED BY PLTFS

Notice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories (AMENDED) FILED BY CENTRAL FLORIDA TRANSPORT LLC

04/03/2020:Notice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories (AMENDED) FILED BY CENTRAL FLORIDA TRANSPORT LLC

Privilege Log FILED BY CENTRAL FLORIDA TRANSPORT LLC

03/26/2020:Privilege Log FILED BY CENTRAL FLORIDA TRANSPORT LLC

Response To Request Production FILED BY CENTRAL FLORIDA TRANSPORT LLC

04/03/2020:Response To Request Production FILED BY CENTRAL FLORIDA TRANSPORT LLC

Notice Of Serving Interrogatories TO PLTF

05/26/2020:Notice Of Serving Interrogatories TO PLTF

Notice of Completion or Compliance WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DEFS

04/15/2020:Notice of Completion or Compliance WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DEFS

Notice of Mediation Conference ON 072020 @930AM VIA ZOOM

06/04/2020:Notice of Mediation Conference ON 072020 @930AM VIA ZOOM

Notice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories FILED BY EVAN JENKINS

06/24/2020:Notice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories FILED BY EVAN JENKINS

Notice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories FILED BY EVAN JENKINS

07/09/2020:Notice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories FILED BY EVAN JENKINS

Civil Cover Sheet

02/15/2019:Civil Cover Sheet

Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

02/15/2019:Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

02/15/2019:Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

Complaint

02/15/2019:Complaint

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Attorney Cover Letter with Attachments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Case 512019CA000543CAAXES Filed with Clerk on 2/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Case Status set to CONSOLIDATED CLOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Case Status set to OPEN

    Read MoreRead Less