This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 06/05/2022 at 00:10:26 (UTC).

IPPOLITO, CINDY VS MEMBERS FIRST CREDIT UNION OF

Case Summary

On 05/01/2022 IPPOLITO, CINDY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MEMBERS FIRST CREDIT UNION OF. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IPPOLITO, CINDY

Defendant

MEMBERS FIRST CREDIT UNION OF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIAMOND, KAELYN STEINKRAUS

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

05/01/2022:Civil Cover Sheet

Statement Of Claim DEMANDS JURY TRIAL

05/01/2022:Statement Of Claim DEMANDS JURY TRIAL

List Of Exhibits A

05/01/2022:List Of Exhibits A

List Of Exhibits B

05/01/2022:List Of Exhibits B

List Of Exhibits C

05/01/2022:List Of Exhibits C

List Of Exhibits D

05/01/2022:List Of Exhibits D

List Of Exhibits E

05/01/2022:List Of Exhibits E

Request For Admissions FILED BY PLTF

05/01/2022:Request For Admissions FILED BY PLTF

Request For Production FILED BY PLTF

05/01/2022:Request For Production FILED BY PLTF

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

05/01/2022:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 061522 @ 1:30 PM

05/12/2022:Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 061522 @ 1:30 PM

Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served ON MEMBERS FIRST CREDIT UNION OF FLORIDA 051822

05/19/2022:Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served ON MEMBERS FIRST CREDIT UNION OF FLORIDA 051822

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 06/15/2022 13:30; Judge: COMPTON, KENT; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: Robert D Sumner Judicial Cente DC Cou

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served ON MEMBERS FIRST CREDIT UNION OF FLORIDA 051822

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 061522 @ 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2022
  • DocketFile Verified To This Point CAF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Production FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Admissions FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketList Of Exhibits E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketList Of Exhibits D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketList Of Exhibits C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketList Of Exhibits B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketList Of Exhibits A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement Of Claim DEMANDS JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2022
  • DocketCase 512022SC002099SCAXES Filed with Clerk on 5/1/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEMBERS FIRST CREDIT UNION OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIAMOND, KAELYN STEINKRAUS