This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 10/17/2020 at 08:33:11 (UTC).

HUDSON RIDGE LTD VS ADAMS, WILBUR Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 HUDSON RIDGE LTD filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ADAMS, WILBUR. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GREY, FRANK I II and GREY, FRANK I. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GREY, FRANK I II

GREY, FRANK I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUDSON RIDGE LTD

Defendants

ADAMS, WILBUR

STEPHENS, ALEXIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOLK, BRIAN PETER

 

Court Documents

Complaint

09/17/2020:Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDefault Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketAttorney Cover Letter without Attachments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketMotion For Final Judgment FILED BY PLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketMotion For Default On AGAINST WILBUR ADAMS AND ALEXIS STEPHENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketAffidavit Of Non Military Service AND VERIFICATION OF CLAIM, DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served 092220 ALEXIS STEPHENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served 092220 WILBUR ADAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCertificate Of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketFile Verified To This Point

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketNotice Designating Email Address FILED BY ATTY OBO PLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCase 512020CC002497CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 9/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less