This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 12/08/2022 at 09:43:04 (UTC).

HUDSON CHIROPRACTIC AND REHABI VS PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE C

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 HUDSON CHIROPRACTIC AND REHABI filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE C. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JUSTICE, JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JUSTICE, JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUDSON CHIROPRACTIC AND REHABI

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE C

Assignee

IGLESIAS, MARISA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAZEGA, RUSSEL MARTIN

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

12/02/2022:Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

12/02/2022:Complaint

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

12/02/2022:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PROGRESSIVE SELECT 02/13/2023 @ 9:00 AM

12/07/2022:Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PROGRESSIVE SELECT 02/13/2023 @ 9:00 AM

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2023
  • HearingEvent Date: 02/13/2023 09:00; Judge: JUSTICE, JOSEPH; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: West Pasco Judicial Center 2B NPR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Or Notice To Appear Issued PROGRESSIVE SELECT 02/13/2023 @ 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketCase 512022SC005852SCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 12/2/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less