This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 02/22/2022 at 10:06:54 (UTC).

HOWARD, EDWARD Et Al VS ACJ HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 HOWARD, EDWARD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ACJ HEATING AIR CONDITIONING. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ANDERSON, DUSTIN THOMAS WARD, ANDERSON, DUSTIN and GREY, FRANK I. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ANDERSON, DUSTIN THOMAS WARD

ANDERSON, DUSTIN

GREY, FRANK I

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HOWARD, EDWARD

HOWARD, MARY ANN

Defendant

ACJ HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING

 

Court Documents

Receipt EVIDENCE

01/10/2022:Receipt EVIDENCE

Final Judgment

01/04/2022:Final Judgment

Order Setting Non Jury Trial 122721 1:00 PM 2E

12/08/2021:Order Setting Non Jury Trial 122721 1:00 PM 2E

Notice of Filing FILED BY PLT

12/07/2021:Notice of Filing FILED BY PLT

Reply Civil TO DEFS CORRESPONDENCE

11/29/2021:Reply Civil TO DEFS CORRESPONDENCE

Correspondence FROM ACJ HEATING AIR CONDITIONING

11/24/2021:Correspondence FROM ACJ HEATING AIR CONDITIONING

Correspondence

11/19/2021:Correspondence

Correspondence

11/19/2021:Correspondence

Notice of Filing W/ATTACHMENTS

11/08/2021:Notice of Filing W/ATTACHMENTS

Order Setting Non Jury Trial 120621 1:30 PM

10/29/2021:Order Setting Non Jury Trial 120621 1:30 PM

Pre-Trial Conference Order 120621 1:30 PM 2E

10/29/2021:Pre-Trial Conference Order 120621 1:30 PM 2E

Reply Civil TO DEFS CORRESPONDENCE

10/12/2021:Reply Civil TO DEFS CORRESPONDENCE

Correspondence FROM DEF

10/01/2021:Correspondence FROM DEF

Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served 091621 ACJ HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING

09/16/2021:Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served 091621 ACJ HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING

Civil Cover Sheet

09/13/2021:Civil Cover Sheet

Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PLAINTIFF/ACJ HEATING AIR CONDITIONING INC 102821 @ 1:30PM

09/13/2021:Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PLAINTIFF/ACJ HEATING AIR CONDITIONING INC 102821 @ 1:30PM

Memorandum To Clerk

09/13/2021:Memorandum To Clerk

Statement Of Claim W/ATTACHMENTS

09/13/2021:Statement Of Claim W/ATTACHMENTS

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt EVIDENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Setting Non Jury Trial 122721 1:00 PM 2E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing FILED BY PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply Civil TO DEFS CORRESPONDENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence FROM ACJ HEATING AIR CONDITIONING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing W/ATTACHMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 10/28/2021 13:30; Judge: ANDERSON, DUSTIN; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: West Pasco Judicial Center 2B NPR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply Civil TO DEFS CORRESPONDENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence FROM DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served 091621 ACJ HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketFile Verified To This Point CAF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Or Notice To Appear Issued PLAINTIFF/ACJ HEATING AIR CONDITIONING INC 102821 @ 1:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum To Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement Of Claim W/ATTACHMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCase 512021SC005186SCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 9/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less