This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 05/13/2019 at 08:31:57 (UTC).

HOUSTON, ANGELA VS ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2019 HOUSTON, ANGELA filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FIRMANI, PAUL E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FIRMANI, PAUL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOUSTON, ANGELA

Defendants

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

TORRES, PEDRO F

Not Classified By Court

DONALDSON, ANGELA K

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHEELER, CLAUDIA JEAN

Defendant Attorney

ROKUSEK, CLARA M RODRIGUEZ

 

Court Documents

Order Transferring Case

06/17/2019:Order Transferring Case

Summons Returned Served PEDRO F TORRES 041019

04/18/2019:Summons Returned Served PEDRO F TORRES 041019

Copy Of CLERICUS REGISTRY

06/17/2019:Copy Of CLERICUS REGISTRY

Response AND OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS

05/13/2019:Response AND OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS

Notice of Filing BY PLTF

05/13/2019:Notice of Filing BY PLTF

Copy Of Court Minutes

05/14/2019:Copy Of Court Minutes

Motion For Default Judgment

04/18/2019:Motion For Default Judgment

Motion For Default On CLERK

04/18/2019:Motion For Default On CLERK

Motion to Withdraw FILED BY ROKUSEK LAW PA OBO DEFENDANT

06/18/2019:Motion to Withdraw FILED BY ROKUSEK LAW PA OBO DEFENDANT

Motion For Default Judgment

04/18/2019:Motion For Default Judgment

Motion For Default On COURTS

04/18/2019:Motion For Default On COURTS

Summons Returned Served ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS 041019

04/18/2019:Summons Returned Served ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS 041019

Notice Of Appearance FILED BY ATTY OBO PLTF

05/03/2019:Notice Of Appearance FILED BY ATTY OBO PLTF

Amended Motion FILED BY DEF

04/30/2019:Amended Motion FILED BY DEF

Notice of Hearing 051419 @ 10:45 AM CT ROOM 2E

04/30/2019:Notice of Hearing 051419 @ 10:45 AM CT ROOM 2E

Notice of Non Availability

04/24/2019:Notice of Non Availability

Copy Of COURT REGISTRY

04/23/2019:Copy Of COURT REGISTRY

Default Entered ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; DEFAULT DENIED AS TO PEDRO F TORRES (PARTY FILED PAPER)

04/22/2019:Default Entered ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; DEFAULT DENIED AS TO PEDRO F TORRES (PARTY FILED PAPER)

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Of Appearance FILED BY ATTY OBO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • File Verified To This Point CR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Motion FILED BY DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing 051419 @ 10:45 AM CT ROOM 2E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Non Availability

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy Of COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Default Entered ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; DEFAULT DENIED AS TO PEDRO F TORRES (PARTY FILED PAPER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Motion For Default On CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2019
  • Summons Returned Served PEDRO F TORRES 041019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer And Affirmative Defense FILED BY PEDRO F TORRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion To Dismiss FILED BY PEDRO F TORRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Of Appearance OBO PEDRO F TORRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request For Production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Case 512019CC001421CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 4/8/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint for Eviction W/EXHIBITS A - B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER FOR PEDRO F TORRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER FOR ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • File Verified To This Point CM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROKUSEK, CLARA M RODRIGUEZ