This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 08/02/2019 at 08:32:20 (UTC).

HOUSE HUNTIN REALTY LLC VS ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 HOUSE HUNTIN REALTY LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FIRMANI, PAUL E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FIRMANI, PAUL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOUSE HUNTIN REALTY LLC

Defendants

ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

LUPARELL, TIFFANY A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2019
  • Writ of Possession ISSD PSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • Final Judgment EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • Copy Of COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Copy Of COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Order OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Default Entered ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS; DEFAULT DENIED TIFFANY LUPARELL (PARTY FILED PAPER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Motion For Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Motion For Default On COURTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Motion For Default On CLERKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Answer FILED BY TIFFANY LUPARELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Summons Returned Served TIFFANY A LUPARELL 062919

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Summons Returned Served ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS 062919

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • File Verified To This Point CM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PLTF FOR ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PLTF FOR TIFFANY A LUPARELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Complaint for Eviction W/ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Case 512019CC002650CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 6/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less