This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 12/28/2021 at 00:13:50 (UTC).

HERNANDO HMA LLC VS JONES, ROBIN

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 HERNANDO HMA LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JONES, ROBIN. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JUSTICE, JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JUSTICE, JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDO HMA LLC

Defendant

JONES, ROBIN

Not Classified By Court

BAYFRONT HEALTH SPRING HILL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY R

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

11/23/2021:Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/23/2021:Complaint

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

11/23/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 020722 @ 11 AM

11/28/2021:Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 020722 @ 11 AM

Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served 120421 ROBIN JONES

12/06/2021:Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served 120421 ROBIN JONES

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 02/07/2022 11:00; Judge: JUSTICE, JOSEPH; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: West Pasco Judicial Center 2B NPR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served 120421 ROBIN JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 020722 @ 11 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCase 512021SC006598SCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 11/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAYFRONT HEALTH SPRING HILL is a litigant

Latest cases where HERNANDO HMA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R