This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 01/03/2022 at 00:10:39 (UTC).

HERNANDO HMA LLC DBA BAYFRONT VS BOWEN, MEGAN

Case Summary

On 11/29/2021 HERNANDO HMA LLC DBA BAYFRONT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BOWEN, MEGAN. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JUSTICE, JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JUSTICE, JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDO HMA LLC DBA BAYFRONT

Defendant

BOWEN, MEGAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY R

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

11/29/2021:Civil Cover Sheet

Statement Of Claim

11/29/2021:Statement Of Claim

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

11/29/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 02/07/2022 @ 11:00 AM MEGAN BOWEN

12/02/2021:Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 02/07/2022 @ 11:00 AM MEGAN BOWEN

Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served 120321 MEGAN BOWEN

12/06/2021:Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served 120321 MEGAN BOWEN

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 02/07/2022 11:00; Judge: JUSTICE, JOSEPH; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: West Pasco Judicial Center 2B NPR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served 120321 MEGAN BOWEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 02/07/2022 @ 11:00 AM MEGAN BOWEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketFile Verified To This Point DSP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement Of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCase 512021SC006662SCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 11/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HERNANDO HMA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R