Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 04/17/2021 at 14:02:03 (UTC).

HALL, MARY H, STANFIELD, MARY E Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 HALL, MARY H, STANFIELD, MARY E was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEARNS, JAMES RICHARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEARNS, JAMES RICHARD

 

Party Details

Decedent

HALL, MARY H

Not Classified By Court

STANFIELD, MARY E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

BUCK, DAVID ALLEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE OF DECEDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCOVER LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketReview of Confidential Information Completed by Clerk for Notice filed on 3/30/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketLetter of Clerk's Determination as to Notice of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketAmended Petition for Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice Of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Filing - Funeral Bill Attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketAffidavit of No Separate Writing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCopy of Last Will and Testament

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Death

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Concerning Criminal History

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketAffidavit of No Florida Estate Tax Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketOath of Personal Representative Designation of Resident Agent and Acceptance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketPetiton for Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCase 512021CP000507CPAXWS Filed with Clerk on 3/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUCK, DAVID ALLEN