This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 06/22/2019 at 13:51:15 (UTC).

H AND M PROPERTY MANAGEMENT IN VS ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2018 H AND M PROPERTY MANAGEMENT IN filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREY, FRANK I. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREY, FRANK I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

H AND M PROPERTY MANAGEMENT IN

Defendants

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

BORRERO, JESIKA

WILLIAMSON, RONNY

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Eviction W/EXHIBITS A - B

12/17/2018:Complaint for Eviction W/EXHIBITS A - B

Final Judgment EVICTION

01/08/2019:Final Judgment EVICTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2019
  • Writ of Possession Returned Served 011619 JESIKA BORRERO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Writ of Possession ISSD TO PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Copy Of COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Default Entered JESIKA BORRERO, RONNY WILLIAMSON, AND ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Motion For Default On COURTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Motion For Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Motion For Default On CLERKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2019
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service JESIKA BORRERO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Summons Returned Served POSTED; ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS 121818

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Summons Returned Served POSTED; RONNY WILLIAMSON 121818

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Summons Returned Served POSTED; JESIKA BORRERO 121818

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • File Verified To This Point CM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER FOR ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER FOR RONNY WILLIAMSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER FOR JESIKA BORRERO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint for Eviction W/EXHIBITS A - B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Case 512018CC004964CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 12/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.