This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 06/22/2019 at 12:24:34 (UTC).

GUPPY HOMES LLC VS PRICILLA, HARRISON

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 GUPPY HOMES LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against PRICILLA, HARRISON. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SESTAK, WILLIAM G and COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D Sumner Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SESTAK, WILLIAM G

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUPPY HOMES LLC

Defendant

PRICILLA, HARRISON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERSCH, LARRY STEWART

 

Court Documents

Attorney Cover Letter with Attachments

03/22/2019:Attorney Cover Letter with Attachments

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2019
  • Exhibits For Id And Or Evidence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Copy Of Court Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Affidavit as to Amounts Due and Owing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Affidavit of Attorney Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Affidavit To Reasonable Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Affidavit As To Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Exhibits For Id And Or Evidence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Final Judgment - DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • File Verified To This Point KA

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2018
  • Default Denied AGAINST PRICILLA HARRISON *PARTY FILED PAPER AND NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT NOT FILED*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Motion For Default On FOR PRICILLA HARRISON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Return of Service on Summons Served (BY SUBSTITUTE) FOR DEFENDANT/ PRICILLA HARRISON ON 112118

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Case Progress Notes FILE IN COURT FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Response FILED BY HARRISON PRISCILLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ELISOR, PRICILLA HARRISON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Case Status set to OPEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Case Status set to OPEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Case 512018CC004536CCAXES Filed with Clerk on 11/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less