Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 11/05/2019 at 08:32:13 (UTC).

GULF TRACE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIAT VS ANY UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IN POSSE Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/01/2019 GULF TRACE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIAT filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ANY UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IN POSSE. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FIRMANI, PAUL E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FIRMANI, PAUL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GULF TRACE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIAT

Defendants

ANY UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IN POSSE

SCAGGS, DARLENE L

DANIEL, STEVEN C

Not Classified By Court

DANIEL, STEVEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREENBERG, DANIEL JASON

 

Court Documents

Notice Of Lis Pendens

10/01/2019:Notice Of Lis Pendens

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Served FOR DEFENDANT/ ANY UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION ON 101519 NMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Served FOR DEFENDANT/ DARLENE L SCAGGS ON 101519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Served (BY SUBSTITUTE) FOR DEFENDANT/ STEVEN C DANIEL ON 101519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER; STEVEN C DANIEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER; DARLENE L SCAGGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER; ANY UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IN POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • File Verified To This Point CM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Copy Of UNSIGNED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Copy Of UNSIGNED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Copy Of UNSIGNED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Complaint W/EXHIBITS A-E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Of Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Case 512019CC004154CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 10/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less