This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 04/15/2019 at 06:01:38 (UTC).

GUIMARAES, VALERIE VS SEITZ, JUDY

Case Summary

On 03/11/2019 GUIMARAES, VALERIE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SEITZ, JUDY. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BYRD, KIMBERLY SHARPE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Pasco County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BYRD, KIMBERLY SHARPE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUIMARAES, VALERIE

Defendant

SEITZ, JUDY

Not Classified By Court

GUIMARAES, VALERIE ROSERO

SEITZ, JUDY ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court Attorney

HUGHES, MARK AVERY

Defendant Attorney

MADONNA, BOBBI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • Answer And Affirmative Defense FILED BY JUDY SEITZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Notice Of Appearance OBO JUDY SEITZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To VALERIE GUIMARAES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Request For Production FILED BY JUDY SEITZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Pluries Summons Returned Served JUDY SEITZ 031919 NMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To JUDY SEITZ ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Case 512019CA000845CAAXWS Filed with Clerk on 3/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Complaint DEMANDS JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • File Verified To This Point CAF

    Read MoreRead Less