This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 02/21/2022 at 06:25:45 (UTC).

GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS POLIZZY, PAOLO

Case Summary

On 08/11/2021 GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed an Other lawsuit against POLIZZY, PAOLO. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GREY, FRANK I, ANDERSON, DUSTIN THOMAS WARD and ANDERSON, DUSTIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GREY, FRANK I

ANDERSON, DUSTIN THOMAS WARD

ANDERSON, DUSTIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

POLIZZY, PAOLO

Not Classified By Court

GTE FINANCIAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOUCH, JEFFREY JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

08/11/2021:Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

08/11/2021:Complaint

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

08/11/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY, PAOLO POLIZZY

08/12/2021:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY, PAOLO POLIZZY

Return of Service on Summons Unserved PAOLO POLIZZY

08/17/2021:Return of Service on Summons Unserved PAOLO POLIZZY

Motion For Default On PAOLO POLIZZY

10/28/2021:Motion For Default On PAOLO POLIZZY

Affidavit Of Non Military Service DEF

10/28/2021:Affidavit Of Non Military Service DEF

Default Entered ON PAOLO POLIZZY

11/17/2021:Default Entered ON PAOLO POLIZZY

Motion For Final Judgment FILED BY GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

12/14/2021:Motion For Final Judgment FILED BY GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Notice of Filing FILED BY GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

12/14/2021:Notice of Filing FILED BY GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Final Judgment

01/04/2022:Final Judgment

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate PL

01/18/2022:Motion to Set Aside/Vacate PL

Order To Vacate FINAL JUDGMENT

01/19/2022:Order To Vacate FINAL JUDGMENT

Final Disposition Form

02/15/2022:Final Disposition Form

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice FILED BY PLF

02/15/2022:Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice FILED BY PLF

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice FILED BY PLF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Disposition Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to RECLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to REOPENED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketReopened for Other Reopen Cause on 1/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder To Vacate FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketReopen Date: 01/19/2022; Reopen Close Date: 02/15/2022; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Set Aside/Vacate PL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion For Final Judgment FILED BY GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Entered ON PAOLO POLIZZY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit Of Non Military Service DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion For Default On PAOLO POLIZZY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Unserved PAOLO POLIZZY 081721 DECEASED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY, PAOLO POLIZZY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCase 512021CC003103CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 8/11/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GTE FINANCIAL is a litigant

Latest cases where GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION DOING BUSINESS AS GTE FINANCIAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JEFFREY J MOUCH, ESQ