This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 08/13/2019 at 08:32:38 (UTC).

GRAHAM, JOHN VS ALL UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESS Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2019 GRAHAM, JOHN filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ALL UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESS. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREY, FRANK I. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREY, FRANK I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRAHAM, JOHN

Defendants

MITTON, CASEY

CARRAO, DANIEL

ALL UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESS

 

Court Documents

Affidavit Of Non Military Service OF UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION

07/09/2019:Affidavit Of Non Military Service OF UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION

Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER FOR CASEY MITTON

07/09/2019:Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER FOR CASEY MITTON

Motion For Default Judgment

07/23/2019:Motion For Default Judgment

Affidavit Of Non Military Service 0F CASEY MITTON

07/09/2019:Affidavit Of Non Military Service 0F CASEY MITTON

Affidavit Of Non Military Service OF DANIEL CARRAO

07/09/2019:Affidavit Of Non Military Service OF DANIEL CARRAO

Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER FOR DANILE CARRAO

07/09/2019:Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER FOR DANILE CARRAO

Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER FOR ALL UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION

07/09/2019:Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER FOR ALL UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION

Motion For Default On COURTS

07/23/2019:Motion For Default On COURTS

Writ of Possession ISSD SHERIFF

08/13/2019:Writ of Possession ISSD SHERIFF

Return of Service on Summons Served CASEY MITTON 061019

07/11/2019:Return of Service on Summons Served CASEY MITTON 061019

Return of Service on Summons Served ALL UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION 071019

07/11/2019:Return of Service on Summons Served ALL UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION 071019

Writ of Possession Returned Served 081919 CASEY MITTON

08/26/2019:Writ of Possession Returned Served 081919 CASEY MITTON

Return of Service on Summons Served DANIEL CARRO 061019

07/11/2019:Return of Service on Summons Served DANIEL CARRO 061019

Copy Of COURT REGISTRY

07/31/2019:Copy Of COURT REGISTRY

Notice of Hearing 081319 930AM

07/31/2019:Notice of Hearing 081319 930AM

Answer FILED BY CASEY MITTON AND DANIEL CARRAO

07/23/2019:Answer FILED BY CASEY MITTON AND DANIEL CARRAO

Complaint for Eviction w/attachment

07/09/2019:Complaint for Eviction w/attachment

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2019
  • File Verified To This Point WM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy Of COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing 081319 930AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer FILED BY CASEY MITTON AND DANIEL CARRAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Motion For Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Motion For Default On COURTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Served ALL UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION 071019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Served DANIEL CARRO 061019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Return of Service on Summons Served CASEY MITTON 061019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • File Verified To This Point CM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service OF UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service OF DANIEL CARRAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service 0F CASEY MITTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER FOR ALL UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER FOR DANILE CARRAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER FOR CASEY MITTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint for Eviction w/attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Case 512019CC002704CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 7/9/2019

    Read MoreRead Less