This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 02/21/2022 at 06:25:18 (UTC).

GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA VS HINTON, JAMES H

Case Summary

On 08/12/2021 GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA filed an Other lawsuit against HINTON, JAMES H. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JUSTICE, JOSEPH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JUSTICE, JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA

Defendant

HINTON, JAMES

Not Classified By Court

HINTON, JAMES H

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZOGG, ERIK

 

Court Documents

Satisfaction Of Judgment

02/01/2022:Satisfaction Of Judgment

Response TO FINAL JUDGMENT FILED BY DEF

01/04/2022:Response TO FINAL JUDGMENT FILED BY DEF

Default Judgment

12/27/2021:Default Judgment

Default Judgment

12/27/2021:Default Judgment

Final Disposition Form

12/16/2021:Final Disposition Form

Motion For Default Judgment FILED BY PLF

12/16/2021:Motion For Default Judgment FILED BY PLF

Default Entered JAMES HINTON

12/07/2021:Default Entered JAMES HINTON

Motion For Default On AGAINST JAMES HINTON

12/03/2021:Motion For Default On AGAINST JAMES HINTON

Affidavit Of Non Military Service

11/30/2021:Affidavit Of Non Military Service

Motion For Default On AGAINST JAMES HINTON

11/30/2021:Motion For Default On AGAINST JAMES HINTON

Default Denied NAME DOES NOT MATCH COMPLAINT

11/20/2021:Default Denied NAME DOES NOT MATCH COMPLAINT

Affidavit Of Non Military Service DEF

11/10/2021:Affidavit Of Non Military Service DEF

Motion For Default On JAMES H HINTON

11/10/2021:Motion For Default On JAMES H HINTON

Return of Service on Summons Served 082421 JAMES HINTON

08/27/2021:Return of Service on Summons Served 082421 JAMES HINTON

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

08/13/2021:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

Summons to be Issued by Clerk JAMES HINTON

08/12/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk JAMES HINTON

Complaint W/ATTACHED EXHIBITS

08/12/2021:Complaint W/ATTACHED EXHIBITS

Civil Cover Sheet

08/12/2021:Civil Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSatisfaction Of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse TO FINAL JUDGMENT FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Disposition Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion For Default Judgment FILED BY PLF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Entered JAMES HINTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion For Default On AGAINST JAMES HINTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketReview of Confidential Information Completed by Clerk for Notice filed on 113021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion For Default On JAMES H HINTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketNotice Of Confidential Information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketNotice Of Confidential Information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served 082421 JAMES HINTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketFile Verified To This Point DSP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk JAMES HINTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint W/ATTACHED EXHIBITS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCase 512021CC003153CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 8/12/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZOGG, ERIK