This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 02/21/2022 at 06:15:17 (UTC).

GOAL-FLORIDA LLC OBO MNSF II W VS KESSLER, CAITLIN MARIE Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/09/2021 GOAL-FLORIDA LLC OBO MNSF II W filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against KESSLER, CAITLIN MARIE. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JUSTICE, JOSEPH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JUSTICE, JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOAL-FLORIDA LLC OBO MNSF II W

Defendants

SALVATO, GARY ROBERT II

KESSLER, CAITLIN MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CRUIKSHANK, ELIZABETH MARIE

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession Returned Served 020222

02/07/2022:Writ of Possession Returned Served 020222

Writ of Possession

01/13/2022:Writ of Possession

Default Judgment

01/11/2022:Default Judgment

Writ of Possession to be Issued

01/11/2022:Writ of Possession to be Issued

Default Judgment

01/11/2022:Default Judgment

Motion For Final Judgment FILED BY GOAL-FLORIDA LLC OBO MNSF II W1 LLC

01/09/2022:Motion For Final Judgment FILED BY GOAL-FLORIDA LLC OBO MNSF II W1 LLC

Default Entered

11/24/2021:Default Entered

Motion For Default On AGAINST GARY R SALVATO II AND CAITLIN M KESSLER

11/14/2021:Motion For Default On AGAINST GARY R SALVATO II AND CAITLIN M KESSLER

Default for Entry by Clerk

11/02/2021:Default for Entry by Clerk

Affidavit Of Non Military Service AS TO GARY ROBERT SALVATO II AND CAITLIN MARIE KESSLER

11/02/2021:Affidavit Of Non Military Service AS TO GARY ROBERT SALVATO II AND CAITLIN MARIE KESSLER

Certificate Of Mailing

08/27/2021:Certificate Of Mailing

Certificate Of Mailing

08/27/2021:Certificate Of Mailing

Return of Service on Summons Served CAITLIN MARIE KESSLER 081821

08/19/2021:Return of Service on Summons Served CAITLIN MARIE KESSLER 081821

Return of Service on Summons Served GARY ROBERT SALVATO II POSTED 081821

08/19/2021:Return of Service on Summons Served GARY ROBERT SALVATO II POSTED 081821

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY CAITLIN MARIE KESSLER

08/09/2021:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY CAITLIN MARIE KESSLER

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY GARY ROBERT SALVATO II

08/09/2021:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY GARY ROBERT SALVATO II

Summons to be Issued by Clerk CAITLIN MARIE KESSLER

08/09/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk CAITLIN MARIE KESSLER

Summons to be Issued by Clerk GARY ROBERT SALVATO II

08/09/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk GARY ROBERT SALVATO II

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Served 020222

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession to be Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion For Final Judgment FILED BY GOAL-FLORIDA LLC OBO MNSF II W1 LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion For Default On AGAINST GARY R SALVATO II AND CAITLIN M KESSLER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault for Entry by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served CAITLIN MARIE KESSLER 081821

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served GARY ROBERT SALVATO II POSTED 081821

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketFile Verified To This Point DSP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY CAITLIN MARIE KESSLER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY GARY ROBERT SALVATO II

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk CAITLIN MARIE KESSLER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk GARY ROBERT SALVATO II

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint W/ATTACHMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCase 512021CC003063CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 8/9/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOAL FLORIDA LLC OBO MNSF II WI LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELIZABETH CRUIKSHANK