This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 02/22/2022 at 07:53:09 (UTC).

GIVENS, ALFRED, GIVENS, ALFRED R Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/30/2021 GIVENS, ALFRED, GIVENS, ALFRED R was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEARNS, JAMES RICHARD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEARNS, JAMES RICHARD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GIVENS, DEBORAH

Not Classified By Court

GIVENS, DEBORAH A

GIVENS, ALFRED

Decedent

GIVENS, ALFRED R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WILLIAMS, STEPHEN R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketAMENDED ORDER DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketORDER DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE OF DECEDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketCOVER LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • Docketcopy of Death Certificate for Alfred R. Givens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketAffidavit of No Florida Estate Tax Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Formal Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketFormal Notice of Petition for Summary Administration and Petition to Determine Homestead Status of Real Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketAffidavit of Heirs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketPetition to Determine Homestead Status of Real Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketPetition for Summary Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCase 512021CP002011CPAXWS Filed with Clerk on 11/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAMS, STEPHEN R