This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 02/21/2022 at 05:46:34 (UTC).

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPAN VS GILCHRIST, TRACEY EILEEN

Case Summary

On 08/03/2021 GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPAN filed an Other lawsuit against GILCHRIST, TRACEY EILEEN. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JUSTICE, JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JUSTICE, JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPAN

Defendant

GILCHRIST, TRACEY EILEEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REISS, JENNIFER L

 

Court Documents

Objection TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEF

02/14/2022:Objection TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEF

Response To Request Production FILED BY PLF

02/14/2022:Response To Request Production FILED BY PLF

Proposed Order

02/07/2022:Proposed Order

Notice OF REQUEST FOR COURT TO CONSIDER MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY WITHOUT HEARING, FILE DBY TRACY GILCHRIST

02/07/2022:Notice OF REQUEST FOR COURT TO CONSIDER MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY WITHOUT HEARING, FILE DBY TRACY GILCHRIST

Motion To Compel FILED BY TRACY GILCHRIST

02/07/2022:Motion To Compel FILED BY TRACY GILCHRIST

Notice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories FILED BY TRACY GILCHRIST

02/07/2022:Notice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories FILED BY TRACY GILCHRIST

Response To Request Production FILED BY TRACY GILCHRIST

02/07/2022:Response To Request Production FILED BY TRACY GILCHRIST

Certification OR DECLARATION AS TO BUSINESS RECORDS

02/04/2022:Certification OR DECLARATION AS TO BUSINESS RECORDS

Motion For Summary Judgment FILED BY PLF

02/04/2022:Motion For Summary Judgment FILED BY PLF

Request To Produce FILED BY TRACEY GILCHRIST

10/18/2021:Request To Produce FILED BY TRACEY GILCHRIST

NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEF TRACEY GILCHRIST

10/18/2021:NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEF TRACEY GILCHRIST

Return of Service on Summons Served TRACEY GILCHRIST; 080621

08/06/2021:Return of Service on Summons Served TRACEY GILCHRIST; 080621

Answer And Affirmative Defense FILED BY TRACY GILCHRIST

08/06/2021:Answer And Affirmative Defense FILED BY TRACY GILCHRIST

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

08/03/2021:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY

Notice Designating Email Address

08/03/2021:Notice Designating Email Address

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

08/03/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Complaint

08/03/2021:Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

08/03/2021:Civil Cover Sheet

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjection TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse To Request Production FILED BY PLF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice OF REQUEST FOR COURT TO CONSIDER MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY WITHOUT HEARING, FILE DBY TRACY GILCHRIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion To Compel FILED BY TRACY GILCHRIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories FILED BY TRACY GILCHRIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse To Request Production FILED BY TRACY GILCHRIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertification OR DECLARATION AS TO BUSINESS RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion For Summary Judgment FILED BY PLF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit in Support of Summary Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest To Produce FILED BY TRACEY GILCHRIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEF TRACEY GILCHRIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served TRACEY GILCHRIST; 080621

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer And Affirmative Defense FILED BY TRACY GILCHRIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Designating Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCase 512021CC002991CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 8/3/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REISS JENNIFER L