This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 06/22/2019 at 12:18:40 (UTC).

G MEGILLAH LLC VS OLESEN, PETER

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 G MEGILLAH LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against OLESEN, PETER. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREY, FRANK I. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREY, FRANK I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

G MEGILLAH LLC

Defendant

OLESEN, PETER

Not Classified By Court

PARK PLACE PORT RICHEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LENOIR, IVAN THADDEUS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2018
  • Writ of Possession Returned Served 121218 PETER OLESEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Writ of Possession ISSD OT SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Final Judgment EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Copy Of COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Default Entered PETER OLESEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Attorney Cover Letter with Attachments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Motion For Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Motion For Default On W/ ATTACHED UNSIGNED CLERKS DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Return of Service on Summons Served 111718 PETER OLESEN NMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER; PETER OLESEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • File Verified To This Point CAF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Exhibit "A" AND "B"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Complaint for Eviction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Case 512018CC004515CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 11/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less