This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 06/22/2019 at 12:26:45 (UTC).

G MEGILLAH LLC VS DUNN, PATRICIA Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 G MEGILLAH LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against DUNN, PATRICIA. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FIRMANI, PAUL E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FIRMANI, PAUL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

G MEGILLAH LLC

Defendants

NULL, JAMES

DUNN, PATRICIA

Not Classified By Court

PARK PLACE PORT RICHEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LENOIR, IVAN THADDEUS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2018
  • Writ of Possession Returned Served 121218 PATRICIA DUNN AND JAMES NULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Writ of Possession ISSD TO SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Final Judgment EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Copy Of COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Default Entered PATRICIA DUNN AND JAMES NULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Attorney Cover Letter with Attachments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Motion For Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Motion For Default On W/ ATTACHED UNSIGNED CLERKS DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Return of Service on Summons Served 111718 JAMES NULL NMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Return of Service on Summons Served 111718 PATRICIA DUNCAN NMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER; JAMES NULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER; PATRICIA DUNCAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • File Verified To This Point CAF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Exhibit "A" AND "B"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Complaint for Eviction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Case 512018CC004516CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 11/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less