This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 05/21/2019 at 18:15:45 (UTC).

FLORIDA STATE DEPART OF TRANSPORTATION VS L S LAW

Case Summary

On 07/17/2015 FLORIDA STATE DEPART OF TRANSPORTATION filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against L S LAW. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORIDA STATE DEPART OF TRANSP

Defendants

JD METAL DECKS INC

JLP MOTORSPORTS INC

SPRINGLEAF HOME EQUITY INC

FASANO MIKE PASCO COUNTY TAX C

WARD-COCHRON, SHARI

REGAN, TIM

LAW, LOIS SIMMONS

Not Classified By Court

LAW, LOIS A

PURPOSE DRIVEN TRANSPORTATION,

AMERICAN GENERAL HOME EQUITY I

SIMMONS BRIDGES, LOIS ANN

SIMMONS, LOIS B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SANCHEZ, ALOYMA M

Defendant Attorneys

HOLLOWAY, DAVID W

REEVES, FREDERICK TRACY

 

Court Documents

Final Disposition Form

05/13/2016:Final Disposition Form

Certificate OF DEPOSIT

08/26/2015:Certificate OF DEPOSIT

Order Of Taking AS TO PARCEL 178

08/12/2015:Order Of Taking AS TO PARCEL 178

Request For Admissions FILED BY PLTF

08/11/2015:Request For Admissions FILED BY PLTF

Notice Dropping Party Or Parties SPRINGLEAF HOME EQUITY INC

08/10/2015:Notice Dropping Party Or Parties SPRINGLEAF HOME EQUITY INC

Summons Returned Served 073115 JLP MOTORSPORTS, INC.

08/06/2015:Summons Returned Served 073115 JLP MOTORSPORTS, INC.

Summons Returned Served 073115 JD METAL DECKS, INC.

08/06/2015:Summons Returned Served 073115 JD METAL DECKS, INC.

Summons Returned Served 073115 DAVID HOLLOWAY

08/06/2015:Summons Returned Served 073115 DAVID HOLLOWAY

Summons Returned Served (SHOW CAUSE) ON SPRINGLEAF HOME EQUITY INC 073115

08/05/2015:Summons Returned Served (SHOW CAUSE) ON SPRINGLEAF HOME EQUITY INC 073115

Summons Returned Unserved ON SHARI WARD COCHRON

08/04/2015:Summons Returned Unserved ON SHARI WARD COCHRON

Summons Returned Served 072915 TIM REGAN

08/04/2015:Summons Returned Served 072915 TIM REGAN

Summons To Show Cause TO LOIS SIMMONS LAW ISSUED PROCESS SERVER

07/29/2015:Summons To Show Cause TO LOIS SIMMONS LAW ISSUED PROCESS SERVER

Summons To Show Cause TO SPRINGLEAF HOME EQUITY INC ISSUED PROCESS SERVER

07/29/2015:Summons To Show Cause TO SPRINGLEAF HOME EQUITY INC ISSUED PROCESS SERVER

Summons To Show Cause TO JD METAL DECKS INC ISSUED PROCESS SERVER

07/29/2015:Summons To Show Cause TO JD METAL DECKS INC ISSUED PROCESS SERVER

Summons To Show Cause TO TIM REGAN ISSUED PROCESS SERVER

07/29/2015:Summons To Show Cause TO TIM REGAN ISSUED PROCESS SERVER

Summons To Show Cause TO JLP MOTORSPORTS INC ISSUED PROCESS SERVER

07/29/2015:Summons To Show Cause TO JLP MOTORSPORTS INC ISSUED PROCESS SERVER

Summons To Show Cause TO SHARI WARD -COCHRAN ISSUED PROCESS SERVER

07/29/2015:Summons To Show Cause TO SHARI WARD -COCHRAN ISSUED PROCESS SERVER

Summons To Show Cause TO PASCO COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR ISSUED PROCESS SERVER

07/29/2015:Summons To Show Cause TO PASCO COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR ISSUED PROCESS SERVER

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Disposition Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • DocketStipulated Final Judgment AS TO PARCEL 178 INCLUDING CONVEYANCE OF PARCEL 715

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • DocketMotion For Final Judgment JOINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • DocketMediation Results Report SETTLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • DocketNotice Of Compliance FILED BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • DocketNotice OF EXCHANGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketDisbursement Of Eminent Domain Monies - CK# 29058, $32.81; MIKE FASANO, TAX COLL, DADE CITY; PARCEL 178

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketDisbursement Of Eminent Domain Monies - CK# 29064, $159,667.19; DAVID W. HOLLOWAY P.A. TRUST ACCOUNT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • DocketNotice IDENTIFYING REPRESENTATIVE WITH SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY FILED BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2015
  • DocketWaiver OF SERVICE OF PROCESS, FILED BY DEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • DocketJudge: BABB , LINDA H Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • DocketCase 512015CA002248CAAXWS Filed with Clerk on 7/17/2015 - CHANGED TO ES 7/21/15 DUE TO LOCATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • DocketWaiver

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Of Taking

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • DocketPETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Lis Pendens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN GENERAL HOME EQUITY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SPRINGLEAF HOME EQUITY INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANCHEZ, ALOYMA M