This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 11/30/2022 at 06:00:38 (UTC).

FLAGSTAR BANK FSB VS LEE, MARLENE E Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/31/2022 FLAGSTAR BANK FSB filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against LEE, MARLENE E. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MANSFIELD, DECLAN P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MANSFIELD, DECLAN P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLAGSTAR BANK FSB

Defendants

LEE, MARLENE E

MARLENE E LEE, UNKNOWN SPOUSE

POSSESSION 1, UNKNOWN PARTY IN

POSSESSION 2, UNKNOWN PARTY IN

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KASPER, KATHRYN ISHEE

Defendant Attorney

RUDY, JOHN FORNEY

 

Court Documents

Return of Service on Summons Served UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 2 SS 111222

11/22/2022:Return of Service on Summons Served UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 2 SS 111222

Return of Service on Summons Served UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1 IND 111222

11/22/2022:Return of Service on Summons Served UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1 IND 111222

Return of Service on Summons Served UNITED STATES OF AMERICA GOV SERVE 111422

11/22/2022:Return of Service on Summons Served UNITED STATES OF AMERICA GOV SERVE 111422

Disclaimer (CONDITIONAL) FILED BY UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

11/18/2022:Disclaimer (CONDITIONAL) FILED BY UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Summons Issued And Returned To ATNY; UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

11/08/2022:Summons Issued And Returned To ATNY; UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Summons Issued And Returned To ATNY; UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 2

11/08/2022:Summons Issued And Returned To ATNY; UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 2

Summons Issued And Returned To ATNY; UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSESSION 1

11/08/2022:Summons Issued And Returned To ATNY; UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSESSION 1

Summons Issued And Returned To ATNY' UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARLENE E LEE

11/08/2022:Summons Issued And Returned To ATNY' UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARLENE E LEE

Summons Issued And Returned To ATNY; MARLENE E LEE

11/08/2022:Summons Issued And Returned To ATNY; MARLENE E LEE

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

10/31/2022:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

10/31/2022:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

10/31/2022:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

New Form A Plaintiff/Lender's Contact Information Sheet

10/31/2022:New Form A Plaintiff/Lender's Contact Information Sheet

Form B Notice To Homeowner

10/31/2022:Form B Notice To Homeowner

Value Calculation for Real Property

10/31/2022:Value Calculation for Real Property

Notice Of Lis Pendens

10/31/2022:Notice Of Lis Pendens

Verified Complaint

10/31/2022:Verified Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

10/31/2022:Civil Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 2 SS 111222

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1 IND 111222

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served UNITED STATES OF AMERICA GOV SERVE 111422

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisclaimer (CONDITIONAL) FILED BY UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATNY; UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATNY; UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATNY; UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSESSION 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATNY' UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARLENE E LEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATNY; MARLENE E LEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNew Form A Plaintiff/Lender's Contact Information Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketForm B Notice To Homeowner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketValue Calculation for Real Property

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Lis Pendens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVerified Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketCase 512022CA002812CAAXWS Filed with Clerk on 10/31/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Flagstar Bank Fsb is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHN F RUDY, III