This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 07/22/2022 at 06:06:20 (UTC).

FIOURIS, MARY VS 7230 PLATHE RD LLC

Case Summary

On 06/22/2022 FIOURIS, MARY filed an Other lawsuit against 7230 PLATHE RD LLC. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BYRD, KIMBERLY SHARPE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BYRD, KIMBERLY SHARPE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIOURIS, MARY

Defendant

7230 PLATHE RD LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOUSKOUTIS, MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

EKONOMIDES, NICKOLAS

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

06/22/2022:Civil Cover Sheet

Verified Complaint

06/22/2022:Verified Complaint

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

06/22/2022:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Notice Of Lis Pendens

06/22/2022:Notice Of Lis Pendens

Summons Issued And Returned To atty

06/23/2022:Summons Issued And Returned To atty

Return of Service on Summons Served 7230 PLATHE RD LLC 062722

06/28/2022:Return of Service on Summons Served 7230 PLATHE RD LLC 062722

Notice Of Appearance DF

07/18/2022:Notice Of Appearance DF

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Appearance DF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served 7230 PLATHE RD LLC 062722

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Lis Pendens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVerified Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketCase 512022CA001660CAAXWS Filed with Clerk on 6/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less