This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 02/23/2022 at 09:35:04 (UTC).

FIGUEROA, PAMELA VS MERCADO RODRIGUEZ, MIGUEL A

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 FIGUEROA, PAMELA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MERCADO RODRIGUEZ, MIGUEL A. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FRAYMAN, EVAN GLENN and GNAGE, BRIAN EDWARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FRAYMAN, EVAN GLENN

GNAGE, BRIAN EDWARD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIGUEROA, PAMELA

Defendant

MERCADO RODRIGUEZ, MIGUEL A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VALLELLANES CAUTHORN, CRISTINA

Defendant Attorney

FERNANDEZ, IVONNE LEONOR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketNotice OF SUPPLEMENTAL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketFinancial Affidavit ; DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCertificate Of Compliance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCertificate Of Compliance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketFinancial Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketFAILURE TO COOPERATE WITH REFERRAL TO MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketFinal Notice to Comply with Referral to Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketReferral to Family Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketCase Management/Status Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Completion of Parenting Course

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketClerk Approved Indigent Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDomestic Relations/Family Law Case Log

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketClerk Approved Indigent Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketApplication for Indigency Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice Of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketMotion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketFamily Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCase 512021DR005055DRAXES Filed with Clerk on 10/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAUTHORN, CRISTINA VALLELLANES