This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 06/22/2019 at 12:31:43 (UTC).

FERRERO, DIANE VS ORTIZ, MICHAEL Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/16/2018 FERRERO, DIANE filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ORTIZ, MICHAEL. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FIRMANI, PAUL E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FIRMANI, PAUL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FERRERO, DIANE

Defendants

ORTIZ, MICHAEL

UNKNOWN, KRYSTAL

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession ISSD TO PLTF

12/06/2018:Writ of Possession ISSD TO PLTF

Default Entered MICHAEL ORTIZ AND KRYSTAL UNKNOWN

12/04/2018:Default Entered MICHAEL ORTIZ AND KRYSTAL UNKNOWN

Affidavit Of Non Military Service

11/28/2018:Affidavit Of Non Military Service

Motion For Default On COURTS

11/28/2018:Motion For Default On COURTS

Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER/MICHAEL ORTIZ

11/16/2018:Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER/MICHAEL ORTIZ

Writ of Possession Returned Unserved

09/25/2019:Writ of Possession Returned Unserved

Motion For Default On CLERKS

11/28/2018:Motion For Default On CLERKS

Summons Returned Served KRYSTAL UNKNOWN 111618

11/20/2018:Summons Returned Served KRYSTAL UNKNOWN 111618

Summons Returned Served MICHAEL ORTIZ 111618

11/20/2018:Summons Returned Served MICHAEL ORTIZ 111618

Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER/KRYSTAL UNKNOWN

11/16/2018:Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER/KRYSTAL UNKNOWN

Motion For Default Judgment

11/28/2018:Motion For Default Judgment

Complaint for Eviction W/ATTACHMENT

11/16/2018:Complaint for Eviction W/ATTACHMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2018
  • Writ of Possession ISSD TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Final Judgment EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Copy Of COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Default Entered MICHAEL ORTIZ AND KRYSTAL UNKNOWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Motion For Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Motion For Default On CLERKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Motion For Default On COURTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Affidavit Of Non Military Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Summons Returned Served MICHAEL ORTIZ 111618

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Summons Returned Served KRYSTAL UNKNOWN 111618

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • File Verified To This Point CAF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER/KRYSTAL UNKNOWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PROCESS SERVER/MICHAEL ORTIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint for Eviction W/ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Case 512018CC004532CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 11/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less