Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 04/14/2019 at 14:37:59 (UTC).

FELDKAMP, JOSEPH VS DALESSANDRO, LINDSEY Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/06/2018 FELDKAMP, JOSEPH filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DALESSANDRO, LINDSEY. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FIRMANI, PAUL E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FIRMANI, PAUL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FELDKAMP, JOSEPH

Defendants

SWEAT, BRIANNA

DALESSANDRO, LINDSEY

DALESSANDRO, RAFFAELE

DUKE ENERGY GLOBAL RISK MANAGE

Not Classified By Court

FELDKAMP, JOSEPH ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Pre-Trial Conference Order TRIAL SET 021419 AT 230PM HEARING ROOM 2E

12/17/2018:Pre-Trial Conference Order TRIAL SET 021419 AT 230PM HEARING ROOM 2E

Statement Of Claim W/ATTACHMENTS

11/06/2018:Statement Of Claim W/ATTACHMENTS

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2019
  • Attorney Cover Letter with Attachments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Attorney Cover Letter with Attachments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre-Trial Conference Order TRIAL SET 021419 AT 230PM HEARING ROOM 2E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Miscellaneous Document FILED BY DUKE ENERGY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Request TO POSTPONE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ON 121718 FILED BY LINDSAY & RAFFAELE D ALESSANDRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • File Verified To This Point JG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served 112618 LINDSAY DALESSANDRO NMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served 112618 RAFFAELE DALESSANDRO NMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served 111218 BRIANNA SWEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served 111518 DULE ENERGY-GLOBA RISK MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Case 512018SC004051SCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 11/6/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement Of Claim W/ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PLAINITFF/LINDSEY DALESSANDRA 121718

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PLAINTIUFF/RAFFAELE DALESSANDRO 121718

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PLAINTIFF/BRIANNA SWEAT 121718

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PLAINTIFF/DUKE ENERGY 121718

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • File Verified To This Point CAF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Event Date: 12/17/2018 14:30; Judge: FIRMANI, PAUL E; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: WS 2B

    Read MoreRead Less