Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 04/28/2019 at 15:28:53 (UTC).

ESSEX INSURANCE COMPANY Et Al VS INTEGRATED DRAINAGE SOLUTIONS Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/25/2010 ESSEX INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against INTEGRATED DRAINAGE SOLUTIONS. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2010

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Pasco County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ESSEX INSURANCE COMPANY

EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY SUC

Defendants

VERIZON SERVICES CORP

WIGGINS, ERICA C

MASTEC INC

INTEGRATED DRAINAGE SOLUTIONS

MASTEC NORTH AMERICA INC

VERIZON FLORIDA LLC

VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS INCORPO

Not Classified By Court

WIGGINS, ERICA

YEAGER LOMBARD, ERICA C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEGERIAN, ARAM PAPKEN

Defendant Attorneys

BOYLE, MARK ANDREW

NEWSOME, CURTIS RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Notice Of Hearing ON 021617 @11AM

11/30/2016:Notice Of Hearing ON 021617 @11AM

Order From District Court Of Appeal Dismiss Appeal 2D14-3912 ORDER NOW FINAL

03/30/2016:Order From District Court Of Appeal Dismiss Appeal 2D14-3912 ORDER NOW FINAL

Order From District Court Of Appeal Dismiss Appeal 2D14-3923

10/15/2015:Order From District Court Of Appeal Dismiss Appeal 2D14-3923

Index Original Record On Appeal (AMENDED)

03/18/2015:Index Original Record On Appeal (AMENDED)

Transcript

12/01/2014:Transcript

Directions To Clerk

10/17/2014:Directions To Clerk

Designations To Court Reporter

10/17/2014:Designations To Court Reporter

Partial Final Judgment FINDING DUTY TO DEFEND W/ RESPECT TO MASTEC NORTH AMERICA INC

10/03/2014:Partial Final Judgment FINDING DUTY TO DEFEND W/ RESPECT TO MASTEC NORTH AMERICA INC

Notice Of Appeal OF NON FINAL ORDER, FILED BY ESSEX INSURANCE COMPANY

08/14/2014:Notice Of Appeal OF NON FINAL ORDER, FILED BY ESSEX INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice Of Hearing 051514 @ 2:00 PM

03/05/2014:Notice Of Hearing 051514 @ 2:00 PM

Motion For Summary Judgment FILED BY MASTEC INC AND MASTEC NORTH AMERICA INC

02/27/2014:Motion For Summary Judgment FILED BY MASTEC INC AND MASTEC NORTH AMERICA INC

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2019
  • Memorandum of Opposition FILED BY MICHAEL W LEONARD ESQ OBO DEF MASTEC INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Memorandum of Opposition FILED BY MICHAEL W LEONARD ESQ OBO VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS INC, VERIZON SERVICES CORP, AND VERIZON FLORIDA LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • ESSEX INSURANCE COMPANY dismissed 2/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • AGREED Order ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND CASE STYLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Motion For Default On INTEGRATED DRAINAGE SOLUTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Copy Of COPY OF DEFAULT AGAINST INTEGRATED DRAINAGE SOLUTIONS, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Motion For Summary Judgment FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Motion For Summary Judgment FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Motion For Summary Judgment FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
206 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2010
  • ASM:CA SUMMONS ISSUED Automatic assessment adjustment from Void Receipt N - 204464; N204464; $-70.00; ESSEX INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2010
  • ASM:CA FF FR 50K AND LESS; N204467; $400.00; ESSEX INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2010
  • ASM:CA SUMMONS ISSUED; N204467; $70.00; ESSEX INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2010
  • ASM:REFUNDS; N204467; $7.50; ESSEX INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2010
  • FILING OPENED FOR SRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2010
  • PMT:CA FF FR 50K AND LESS; N204464; $400.00; VOIDED RECEIPT; ESSEX INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2010
  • PMT:CA SUMMONS ISSUED; N204464; $70.00; VOIDED RECEIPT; ESSEX INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2010
  • PMT:CA FF FR 50K AND LESS; N204467; $400.00; ESSEX INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2010
  • PMT:CA SUMMONS ISSUED; N204467; $70.00; ESSEX INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2010
  • PMT:REFUNDS; N204467; $7.50; ESSEX INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ESSEX INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where VERIZON FLORIDA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Mastec Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where MASTEC NORTH AMERICA INC is a litigant