This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 04/19/2019 at 06:03:16 (UTC).

ELLIS, JOSHUA VS HATZOPOULOS, IRAKLIS Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/15/2019 ELLIS, JOSHUA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HATZOPOULOS, IRAKLIS. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MANSFIELD, DECLAN P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Pasco County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MANSFIELD, DECLAN P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELLIS, JOSHUA

Defendants

HATZOPOULOS, IRAKLIS

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROZYNA, DILLON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • Affidavit Service Of SUMMONS SERVED ON IRAKLIS HATZOPOULOS 040519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Notice Of Service OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Affidavit Service Of SUMMONS SERVED ON UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION INC 032819

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION ISSUED TO PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To IRAKLIS HATZOPOULOS ISSUED TO PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • File Verified To This Point GC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Case 512019CA000902CAAXWS Filed with Clerk on 3/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Complaint DEMAMD FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To IRAKLIS HATZOPOULOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Request To Produce IRAKLIS HATZOPOULOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Request For Admissions IRAKLIS HATZOPOULOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Request To Produce UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less