This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 10/17/2020 at 08:33:03 (UTC).

EDWARDS, FRANCES VS SCALLCI, JOE

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 EDWARDS, FRANCES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SCALLCI, JOE. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are GREY, FRANK I II and GREY, FRANK I. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

GREY, FRANK I II

GREY, FRANK I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EDWARDS, FRANCES

Defendants

SCALLCI, JOE

SCALICI, JOE

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Eviction

09/17/2020:Complaint for Eviction

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketCopy Of COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketOrder OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCertificate Of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served (IND) JOE SCALICI 091820

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAnswer JOE SCHLICI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketFile Verified To This Point GC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketAffidavit Of Non Military Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint for Eviction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCase 512020CC002475CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 9/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less