This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 12/05/2019 at 11:30:38 (UTC).

DUNSHEE, AMBER N VS DUNSHEE, JON

Case Summary

On 10/31/2019 DUNSHEE, AMBER N filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DUNSHEE, JON. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUNSHEE, AMBER N

Defendant

DUNSHEE, JON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PRZEPIS, BRUCE EDWARD

Defendant Attorney

PRESCOTT, TERESA O

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketAnswer FILED BY RESP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketAnswer and Counter Petition FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF AND RESPONDENTS COUNTER PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITHOUT MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketNotice Of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Social Security Number FILED OBO JON DUNSHEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketNotice Of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Filing FILED BY AMBER DUNSHEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketTEMP Standing Order FOR FAMILY LAW CASES W/ NO MINOR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketCertificate Of Compliance FILED OBO AMBER N DUNSHEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketFinancial Affidavit FILED BY PTLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Filing WIFES FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketFile Verified To This Point JRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketNotice Designating Email Address FILED BY BRUCE E. PRZEPIS OBO PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketNotice Of Appearance FILED BY BRUCE E. PRZEPIS OBO PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketRequest To Produce FILED BY PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketNotice Of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketPetitioners Notice Of Social Security Number Confi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketNotice Of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage W/ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketFamily Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketCase 512019DR005780DRAXES Filed with Clerk on 10/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRESCOTT , TERESA O