Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 11/05/2019 at 08:31:52 (UTC).

DUKE, BECKY Et Al VS HURD, ANDREW Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/01/2019 DUKE, BECKY filed an Other lawsuit against HURD, ANDREW. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREY, FRANK I. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREY, FRANK I

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DUKE, BRIAN

DUKE, BECKY

Defendants

RICKER, WILLIAM

HURD, ANDREW

RICKER, GRACI

RICKER, DANNA

Not Classified By Court

RICKER, WILLIAM HERBERT

RICKER, DANA LYNETTE

 

Court Documents

Order Of Dismissal

10/18/2019:Order Of Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • Copy Of COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • Answer FILED BY DANA RICKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • Motion To Dismiss FILED BY BECKY DUKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • Motion TO DISMISS FILED BY BRIAN DUKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • Answer FILED BY DANA RICKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • Summons Returned Served ANDREW HURD 100119

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • Summons Returned Served GRACI RICKER 100119

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • Summons Returned Served WILLIAM RICKER 100119

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • Summons Returned Served DANNA RICKER 100119

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • File Verified To This Point JRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PLTF ON WILLIAM RICKER/DANNA RICKER/ ANDREW HURD AND GRACI RICKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PLTF ON WILLIAM RICKER/DANNA RICKER/ ANDREW HURD AND GRACI RICKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PLTF ON WILLIAM RICKER/DANNA RICKER/ ANDREW HURD AND GRACI RICKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To PLTF ON WILLIAM RICKER/DANNA RICKER/ ANDREW HURD AND GRACI RICKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Complaint on Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Case 512019CC004141CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 10/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less