Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 05/07/2019 at 08:31:54 (UTC).

DRYWIZARD DRYWALL SERVICES INC VS TOWER HILL PREFERRED INSURANCE

Case Summary

On 04/02/2019 DRYWIZARD DRYWALL SERVICES INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TOWER HILL PREFERRED INSURANCE. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D Sumner Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DRYWIZARD DRYWALL SERVICES INC

Defendant

TOWER HILL PREFERRED INSURANCE

Assignee

JONES, THOMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GILBERT, GUY HERBERT

Defendant Attorney

GARCIA, MARCELLA L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2019
  • Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Jury Trial FILED BY TOWER HILL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Notice Of Appearance OBO TOWER HILL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Notice Designating Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY, TOWER HILL PREFERRED INSURANCE CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Case 512019CC001378CCAXES Filed with Clerk on 4/2/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Request For Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Request To Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Notice Designating Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DRYWIZARD DRYWALL SERVICES INC AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR WHITEFIELD, JEANNA AS ASSIGNEE OF- FOR WHITEFIELD, THOMAS is a litigant

Latest cases where Tower Hill Preferred Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA , MARCELLA L.