This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 10/19/2021 at 07:11:51 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS MOORE, JOYCE L

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MOORE, JOYCE L. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ANDERSON, DUSTIN THOMAS WARD, ANDERSON, DUSTIN, GREY, FRANK I II and GREY, FRANK I. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ANDERSON, DUSTIN THOMAS WARD

ANDERSON, DUSTIN

GREY, FRANK I II

GREY, FRANK I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

MOORE, JOYCE L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZOGG, ERIK

 

Court Documents

Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 11/9/2021 @ 1:30 PM JOYCE L MOORE

09/28/2021:Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 11/9/2021 @ 1:30 PM JOYCE L MOORE

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

09/14/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Statement Of Claim

09/14/2021:Statement Of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

09/14/2021:Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/09/2021 13:30; Judge: ANDERSON, DUSTIN; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: West Pasco Judicial Center 2B NPR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 11/9/2021 @ 1:30 PM JOYCE L MOORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement Of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCase 512021SC005246SCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 9/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZOGG, ERIK