This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 10/19/2021 at 07:11:42 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS JONES, JEFFREY A

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JONES, JEFFREY A. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COMPTON, KENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COMPTON, KENT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

JONES, JEFFREY A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZOGG, ERIK

 

Court Documents

Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served 100121 NMA JEFFEY A JONES

10/05/2021:Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served 100121 NMA JEFFEY A JONES

Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 12/29/2021 @ 10:00 AM; JONES JEFFREY A

09/21/2021:Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 12/29/2021 @ 10:00 AM; JONES JEFFREY A

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

09/14/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Statement Of Claim

09/14/2021:Statement Of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

09/14/2021:Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 12/29/2021 10:00; Judge: COMPTON, KENT; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: Robert D Sumner Judicial Cente DC Cou

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served 100121 NMA JEFFEY A JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Or Notice To Appear Issued PTC 12/29/2021 @ 10:00 AM; JONES JEFFREY A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement Of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCase 512021SC005244SCAXES Filed with Clerk on 9/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZOGG, ERIK