Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 04/14/2019 at 15:00:00 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS FAQUSEH, ISMAIL

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 DISCOVER BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FAQUSEH, ISMAIL. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FIRMANI, PAUL E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FIRMANI, PAUL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

FAQUSEH, ISMAIL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TURNER, LAUREN NICHOLE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2019
  • County Court Mediation Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Pre-Trial Conference Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served 122218; FAQUSEH ISMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • File Verified To This Point JG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PROCESS SERVER; 012819 AT 1100AM COURTROOM 2B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Case 512018SC004097SCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 11/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Complaint W/ATTACHED EXHIBITS 1 AND 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Notice Of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • File Verified To This Point CAF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Event Date: 01/28/2019 11:00; Judge: FIRMANI, PAUL E; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: WS 2B

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Turner, Lauren N