This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 02/23/2022 at 09:24:15 (UTC).

DION, STEPHEN GEORGE JR VS CRESSMAN, SARAH ROSE

Case Summary

On 10/18/2021 DION, STEPHEN GEORGE JR filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against CRESSMAN, SARAH ROSE. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, Robert D Sumner Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FRAYMAN, EVAN GLENN and GNAGE, BRIAN EDWARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FRAYMAN, EVAN GLENN

GNAGE, BRIAN EDWARD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DION, STEPHEN GEORGE JR

Defendant

CRESSMAN, SARAH ROSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALVERO, KHARA A.

Defendant Attorney

LAW, JOSHUA A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketOrder Setting CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketOrder On Case Management Conference/STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Trial THIS CASE IS AT ISSUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Filing W/ATTD C/S GUIDELINES FILED BY PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Filing W/ATTD PARENTING PLAN FILED BY PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketRequest For Production FILED BY PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketOrder SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VIA ZOOM 021522 AT 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketOrder On Case Management Conference CMC 021522 AT 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketMediated Settlement Agreement TEMPORARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketMediation Results Report PARTIAL AGREEMENT (TEMPORARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketNotice Of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketNotice Of Serving Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketFinancial Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Social Security Number

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketUniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketPetition TO ESTABLISH PARENTING PLAN, MODIFY CHILD SUPPORT AND OTHER RELATED RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketNotice Of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketFamily Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketNotice Of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketCase 512021DR005194DRAXES Filed with Clerk on 10/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALVERO , KHARA A.