Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 05/24/2019 at 23:17:08 (UTC).

DIGGINS, SARAH VS GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPA Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/25/2016 DIGGINS, SARAH filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPA. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center located in Pasco, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Pasco County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIGGINS, SARAH

Defendants

UNKNOWN INSURANCE COMPANY FOUR

UNKNOWN INSURANCE COMPANY THRE

PALM HARBOR AUTO MALL INC

UNKNOWN INSURANCE COMPANY TWO

GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPA

UNKNOWN INSURANCE COMPANY ONE

Not Classified By Court

WESTCOAST AUTO MALL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAKRIS, ASHLEY VICTORIA

Defendant Attorneys

FRAYMAN, EVAN GLENN

DAVIS, MATTHEW GORDON

 

Court Documents

Order Granting PLFT'S AMENDEDED MOTION TO TRANSFER JUDGE SHARP-BYRD

08/28/2018:Order Granting PLFT'S AMENDEDED MOTION TO TRANSFER JUDGE SHARP-BYRD

Motion to Transfer TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT AND AMEND CASE CAPTION

05/09/2018:Motion to Transfer TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT AND AMEND CASE CAPTION

Amended Motion TO TRANSFER TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT AND AMEND CASE CAPTION

05/09/2018:Amended Motion TO TRANSFER TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT AND AMEND CASE CAPTION

Order Granting DEFENDANTS PALM HARBOR AUTO MALL INC VERIFIED MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR ABATE AND COMPEL ARITRATION

11/22/2017:Order Granting DEFENDANTS PALM HARBOR AUTO MALL INC VERIFIED MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR ABATE AND COMPEL ARITRATION

Default Denied AGAINST PALM HARBOR AUTO MALL INC PARTY FILED PAPER

07/28/2017:Default Denied AGAINST PALM HARBOR AUTO MALL INC PARTY FILED PAPER

Notice Of Appearance AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS, FILED BY ATTY OBO PALM HARBOR AUTO MALL, INC.

07/27/2017:Notice Of Appearance AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS, FILED BY ATTY OBO PALM HARBOR AUTO MALL, INC.

Motion for Default and Proposed Default AGAINST PALM HARBOR AUTO MALL, INC.

07/25/2017:Motion for Default and Proposed Default AGAINST PALM HARBOR AUTO MALL, INC.

Notice of Filing EXHIBIT A, FILED BY PLF

07/25/2017:Notice of Filing EXHIBIT A, FILED BY PLF

Notice of Hearing ON 062317 @ 9:45AM

04/18/2017:Notice of Hearing ON 062317 @ 9:45AM

Summons Returned Served 040417 PALM HARBOR AUTO MALL

04/11/2017:Summons Returned Served 040417 PALM HARBOR AUTO MALL

Request For Admissions FILED BY PLTF

03/28/2017:Request For Admissions FILED BY PLTF

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY; GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

02/06/2017:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY; GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Summons Returned Unserved GREAT AMERICAN INS. CO.

01/25/2017:Summons Returned Unserved GREAT AMERICAN INS. CO.

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

01/25/2017:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons Returned Unserved PALM HARBOR AUTO MALL NON-SERVED

01/20/2017:Summons Returned Unserved PALM HARBOR AUTO MALL NON-SERVED

Summons Issued And Returned To GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE CO ISSUED ATTY

09/21/2016:Summons Issued And Returned To GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE CO ISSUED ATTY

Summons Issued And Returned To PALM HARBOR AUTO MALL INC ISSUED ATTY

09/21/2016:Summons Issued And Returned To PALM HARBOR AUTO MALL INC ISSUED ATTY

Motion FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION; FILED BY PLTF

08/25/2016:Motion FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION; FILED BY PLTF

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2019
  • Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice PL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Order For Withdrawal As Attorney Of Record OBO PALM HARBOR AUTO MALL INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Motion to Withdraw FILED BY PALM HARBOR AUTO MALL INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Exhibit A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Exhibit B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Attorney Cover Letter without Attachments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Granting PLFT'S AMENDEDED MOTION TO TRANSFER JUDGE SHARP-BYRD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Order Granting(AGREED)DEFENDANT BRIAN HARRIS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES JUDGE SHARPE-BYRD

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2016
  • Case 512016CA002810CAAXWS Filed with Clerk on 8/25/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • Request To Produce FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION; FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • Notice Designating Email Add OBO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • Notice OF INTENT TO DISPOSE OF OR ALTER VEHICLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • Notice Of Serving Interrogatories To PALM HARBOR AUTO MALL INC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Great American Insurance Company of New York is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIS, MATTHEW GORDON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EVAN FRAYMAN