This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 06/22/2019 at 12:32:04 (UTC).

DICKERSON, MATT B VS GODFREY, PAMELA A

Case Summary

On 11/16/2018 DICKERSON, MATT B filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against GODFREY, PAMELA A. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREY, FRANK I. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREY, FRANK I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DICKERSON, MATT B

Defendants

GODFREY, PAMELA A

ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCGUIRE, JOHN FRANCIS

 

Court Documents

Copy Of Court Minutes

01/14/2019:Copy Of Court Minutes

Answer FILED BY AMY REMY

12/04/2018:Answer FILED BY AMY REMY

Complaint for Eviction and Back Rent - up to $15,000

11/16/2018:Complaint for Eviction and Back Rent - up to $15,000

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2019
  • Copy Of Court Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Copy Of COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Affidavit OF DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Writ of Possession Returned Served 011619 ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Case Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Writ of Possession (AS TO ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION ONLY) ISSD TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Final Judgment AS TO ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy Of Court Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Motion TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE; GRANTED JUDGE GREY 01/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Correspondence TO JUDGE FROM NONPARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2018
  • Return of Service on Summons Served ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION 112818

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer FILED BY AMY REMY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ; ALL OTHERS IN POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Summons Issued And Returned To ; PAMELA A GODFREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Notice of Filing SEVEN DAY NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • File Verified To This Point CM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Exhibit A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint for Eviction and Back Rent - up to $15,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Copy Of UNISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Case 512018CC004606CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 11/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.