This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 10/12/2021 at 19:52:33 (UTC).

DEMARSE, MARIE Et Al VS AVATAR PROPERTY AND CASUALTY I

Case Summary

On 08/17/2021 DEMARSE, MARIE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AVATAR PROPERTY AND CASUALTY I. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GROGER, GREGORY G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GROGER, GREGORY G

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DEMARSE, PAUL

DEMARSE, MARIE

Defendant

AVATAR PROPERTY AND CASUALTY I

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEONARDIS, RICHARD GERARD

Defendant Attorney

KOELLING, CRAIG JAMES

 

Court Documents

Response To Request Production DF

10/07/2021:Response To Request Production DF

Notice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories DF

10/07/2021:Notice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories DF

Response To Request For Admissions DF

10/07/2021:Response To Request For Admissions DF

Privilege Log DF

10/07/2021:Privilege Log DF

Notice of Taking Video Deposition FILED BY PLTFS

09/15/2021:Notice of Taking Video Deposition FILED BY PLTFS

Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Jury Trial DF

09/10/2021:Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Jury Trial DF

Notice of Taking Video Deposition FILED BY PLTFS

08/31/2021:Notice of Taking Video Deposition FILED BY PLTFS

Notice Of Appearance CRAIG KOELLING ESQ OBO DEF

08/31/2021:Notice Of Appearance CRAIG KOELLING ESQ OBO DEF

Notice of Filing FILED BY PLTFS

08/25/2021:Notice of Filing FILED BY PLTFS

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

08/17/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Notice Designating Email Address

08/17/2021:Notice Designating Email Address

Notice Of Taking Deposition

08/17/2021:Notice Of Taking Deposition

Notice of Taking Video Deposition

08/17/2021:Notice of Taking Video Deposition

Notice Of Serving Interrogatories AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

08/17/2021:Notice Of Serving Interrogatories AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Request For Admissions AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

08/17/2021:Request For Admissions AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Request To Produce AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

08/17/2021:Request To Produce AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Complaint DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

08/17/2021:Complaint DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Civil Cover Sheet

08/17/2021:Civil Cover Sheet

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse To Request Production DF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories DF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse To Request For Admissions DF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPrivilege Log DF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Video Deposition FILED BY PLTFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer, Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Jury Trial DF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Video Deposition FILED BY PLTFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Appearance CRAIG KOELLING ESQ OBO DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing FILED BY PLTFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Designating Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Taking Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Video Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Serving Interrogatories AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Admissions AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest To Produce AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCase 512021CA001912CAAXES Filed with Clerk on 8/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Avatar Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOELLING CRAIG JAMES