This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 10/12/2021 at 10:05:45 (UTC).

DE JESUS DIAZ, GENARO Et Al VS NPC INTERNATIONAL INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 DE JESUS DIAZ, GENARO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NPC INTERNATIONAL INC. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GROGER, GREGORY G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GROGER, GREGORY G

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GENARO DE JESUS DIAZ AS PARENT

DE JESUS DIAZ, GENARO

Defendants

O GORMAN, DARIAN CHASE

O GORMAN, TAMMY L

NPC INTERNATIONAL INC

Not Classified By Court

PIZZA HUT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOAN, KEITH MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

PARKER, DALE LEE

 

Court Documents

Notice Of Telephonic Hearing 11/15/21 @ 9:00 AM

09/03/2021:Notice Of Telephonic Hearing 11/15/21 @ 9:00 AM

Amended Motion FOR CASE MGT CONFERENCE, FILED BY DARIAN AND TAMMY OGORMAN

08/27/2021:Amended Motion FOR CASE MGT CONFERENCE, FILED BY DARIAN AND TAMMY OGORMAN

Response To Request Production FILED BY GENARO DE JESUS DIAZ

08/13/2021:Response To Request Production FILED BY GENARO DE JESUS DIAZ

Notice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories FILED BY GENARO DE JESUS DIAZ AS PARENT

08/13/2021:Notice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories FILED BY GENARO DE JESUS DIAZ AS PARENT

Response To Request Production FILED BY GENARO DE JESUS DIAZ

08/13/2021:Response To Request Production FILED BY GENARO DE JESUS DIAZ

Notice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories FILED BY GENARO DE JESUS DIAZ

08/13/2021:Notice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories FILED BY GENARO DE JESUS DIAZ

Motion FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DF

07/20/2021:Motion FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DF

Motion To Compel DF

07/12/2021:Motion To Compel DF

Motion To Compel DF

07/12/2021:Motion To Compel DF

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY; FOR NPC INTERNATIONAL INC

02/08/2021:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY; FOR NPC INTERNATIONAL INC

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY; FOR DARIAN CHASE O'GORMAN

02/08/2021:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY; FOR DARIAN CHASE O'GORMAN

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY; FOR TAMMY L O'GORMAN

02/08/2021:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY; FOR TAMMY L O'GORMAN

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

01/27/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

01/27/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

Notice Designating Email Address

01/27/2021:Notice Designating Email Address

Complaint

01/27/2021:Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

01/27/2021:Civil Cover Sheet

Summons to be Issued by Clerk

01/27/2021:Summons to be Issued by Clerk

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Telephonic Hearing 11/15/21 @ 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Motion FOR CASE MGT CONFERENCE, FILED BY DARIAN AND TAMMY OGORMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse To Request Production FILED BY GENARO DE JESUS DIAZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories FILED BY GENARO DE JESUS DIAZ AS PARENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse To Request Production FILED BY GENARO DE JESUS DIAZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories FILED BY GENARO DE JESUS DIAZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion To Compel DF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion To Compel DF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse To Request Production DF

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY; FOR NPC INTERNATIONAL INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY; FOR DARIAN CHASE O'GORMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ATTY; FOR TAMMY L O'GORMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons to be Issued by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Designating Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCase 512021CA000180CAAXES Filed with Clerk on 1/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NPC INTERNATIONAL, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOAN , KEITH MICHAEL