This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 03/26/2019 at 06:02:50 (UTC).

DAVIS, LANITRA VS 7 ELEVEN INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2019 DAVIS, LANITRA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 7 ELEVEN INC. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GROGER, GREGORY G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Pasco County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GROGER, GREGORY G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVIS, LANITRA

Defendants

AVITAZ CORPORATION

NORTHEY, CHARLES

7 ELEVEN INC

CITY OF ZEPHYRHILLS POLICE DEP

FLORIDA HOSPITAL ZEPHYRHILLS I

Not Classified By Court

FLOYD, LANITRA

FLORIDA HOSPITAL ZEPHYRHILLS

DAVIS, LANITRA LASHAWN

7 ELEVEN STORE #37745A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUDGINS, DREW BEN

 

Court Documents

Witness and Exhibit List FILED BY DEF

12/11/2019:Witness and Exhibit List FILED BY DEF

Witness and Exhibit List FILED BY 7 ELEVEN INC

12/05/2019:Witness and Exhibit List FILED BY 7 ELEVEN INC

Notice of Mediation Conference

01/08/2020:Notice of Mediation Conference

AMENDED Notice of Mediation Conference

01/09/2020:AMENDED Notice of Mediation Conference

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice AS TO CITY OF ZEPHYRHILLS, AVITAZ CORP. 7 - ELEVEN INC & CHARLES NORTHEY

03/26/2020:Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice AS TO CITY OF ZEPHYRHILLS, AVITAZ CORP. 7 - ELEVEN INC & CHARLES NORTHEY

Order Of Dismissal AS TO FLORIDA HOSPITAL ZEPHYRHILLS INC DBA ADVENTHEALTH ZEPHYRHILLS ONLY

06/11/2019:Order Of Dismissal AS TO FLORIDA HOSPITAL ZEPHYRHILLS INC DBA ADVENTHEALTH ZEPHYRHILLS ONLY

Amended Complaint PL

03/25/2019:Amended Complaint PL

Complaint W/ATTACHMENT DEMANDS JURY TRIAL

02/19/2019:Complaint W/ATTACHMENT DEMANDS JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2019
  • Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Case 512019CA000594CAAXES Filed with Clerk on 2/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint W/ATTACHMENT DEMANDS JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less