This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 10/18/2020 at 08:33:08 (UTC).

DASS, SADENNA Et Al VS BOARD, CHELSEA Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 DASS, SADENNA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BOARD, CHELSEA. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FIRMANI, PAUL EDWIN and FIRMANI, PAUL E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FIRMANI, PAUL EDWIN

FIRMANI, PAUL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DASS, SADENNA

RAGNAUTH, VASHTI DASS

Defendants

BOARD, CHELSEA

MOSS, CHRISTOPHER

Not Classified By Court

DASS, SADEENA A

 

Court Documents

Copy Of COURT REGISTRY

10/02/2020:Copy Of COURT REGISTRY

Correspondence ON LEASE DIFFERENCE FILED BY PLTF

09/29/2020:Correspondence ON LEASE DIFFERENCE FILED BY PLTF

Default Denied

09/29/2020:Default Denied

Correspondence SADEENA DASS

09/29/2020:Correspondence SADEENA DASS

Motion FOR HEARING

09/24/2020:Motion FOR HEARING

Answer CHELSEA BOARD AND CHRISTOPHER MORR

09/24/2020:Answer CHELSEA BOARD AND CHRISTOPHER MORR

Complaint for Eviction

09/18/2020:Complaint for Eviction

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy Of COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketCopy Of COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing 101520 @ 2:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketFile Verified To This Point CAF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence ON LEASE DIFFERENCE FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketMotion For Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketMotion For Default On CHRISTOPHER MORR AND CHELSEEA BOARD / COURTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketMotion For Default On CHRISTOPHER MORR AND CHELSEA BOARD / CLERKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAffidavit Of Non Military Service

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence SADEENA DASS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer CHELSEA BOARD AND CHRISTOPHER MORR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served 091820 CHELSEA BOARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketReturn of Service on Summons Served 091820 CHRISTOPHER MOSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint for Eviction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCase 512020CC002488CCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 9/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less