This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 09/09/2021 at 06:37:30 (UTC).

DALL, PAUL E, HALL, ALLISON Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 DALL, PAUL E, HALL, ALLISON was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEARNS, JAMES RICHARD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEARNS, JAMES RICHARD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HALL, ALLISON

Decedent

DALL, PAUL E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CIESLA, LARRY EDWARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2021
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING EXEMPT PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2021
  • DocketORDER DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2021
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketAffidavit of No Florida Estate Tax Due (DR-312)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Formal Notice of Petition for Summary Administration, Petition for Determination of Exempt Property, and Petition for Determination of Homestead Status of Real Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketAcknowledgement, Waiver and Consent JKD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketFormal Notice of Petition for Summary Administration, Petition for Determination of Exempt Property, and Petition for Determination of Homestead Status of Real Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketDeath Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketWill

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketPetition to Determine Homestead Status of Real Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketPetition to Determine Exempt Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketPetition for Summary Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCase 512021CP000735CPAXES Filed with Clerk on 5/3/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CIESLA, LARRY E.