Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 04/20/2021 at 14:05:10 (UTC).

DALBERTH, CHRISTINA R, STALLEY, DOUGLAS B Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 DALBERTH, CHRISTINA R, STALLEY, DOUGLAS B was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEARNS, JAMES RICHARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEARNS, JAMES RICHARD

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

STALLEY, DOUGLAS B

Decedent

DALBERTH, CHRISTINA R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

ALVAREZ, DEREK BRIAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE OF DECEDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCOVER LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketReview of Confidential Information Completed by Clerk for Notice filed on 4/8/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNotice Of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketPETITION TO WAIVE BOND OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND WAIVER OF NOTICE & BOND SIGNED BY LD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND WAIVER OF NOTICE & BOND SIGNED BY RSD INDIVIDUALLY AS A QUALIFIED BENEFICIARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND WAIVER OF NOTICE & BOND SIGNED BY RSD TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DISINTERESTED WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ESTABLISHMENT AND PROBATE OF LOST OR DESTROYED WILL AND APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCase 512021CP000579CPAXWS Filed with Clerk on 4/8/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALVAREZ , DEREK B