This case was last updated from Pasco County Circuit Courts on 05/21/2019 at 15:13:59 (UTC).

D E STIVLER VS TAYLOR MORRISON HOME CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/22/2015 D E STIVLER filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against TAYLOR MORRISON HOME CORPORATION. This case was filed in Pasco County Circuit Courts, Robert D. Sumner Judicial Center - Circuit Court located in Pasco, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXES

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STIVLER, DANIEL E

Defendants

HMT ENGINEERING INC

MARCO AGUIRRE STUCCO INC

TAYLOR MORRISON SERVICES INC

TAHERI, HOSEIN H

TAYLOR MORRISON HOME CORPORATI

HIGHWOODS CONTRACTING CORPORAT

Not Classified By Court

MORRISON HOME CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TANNENBAUM, ALAN E

Defendant Attorneys

CHUSID, MITCHEL

KATZ, MITCHELL RYAN

ZAIFERT, JONATHAN NEIL

 

Court Documents

Order From District Court Of Appeal Dismiss Appeal 2D16-4474

02/13/2017:Order From District Court Of Appeal Dismiss Appeal 2D16-4474

Notice Of Appeal FILED BY TAYLOR MORRISON SERVICES INC

09/23/2016:Notice Of Appeal FILED BY TAYLOR MORRISON SERVICES INC

Summons Returned Served ON HIGHWOODS CONTRACTING CORPORATION 092016

09/21/2016:Summons Returned Served ON HIGHWOODS CONTRACTING CORPORATION 092016

Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY FOR HIGHWOODS CONTRACTING CORPORATION

09/07/2016:Summons Issued And Returned To ATTY FOR HIGHWOODS CONTRACTING CORPORATION

Answer And Affirmative Defense FILED BY HMT ENGINEERING INC. AND HOSEIN TAHERI, DEMAND JURY TRIAL

09/02/2016:Answer And Affirmative Defense FILED BY HMT ENGINEERING INC. AND HOSEIN TAHERI, DEMAND JURY TRIAL

Order Denying DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS AND COMPEL ARBITRATION

08/25/2016:Order Denying DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS AND COMPEL ARBITRATION

Notice Of Hearing ON 062816 @10AM

01/26/2016:Notice Of Hearing ON 062816 @10AM

Notice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories FILED BY PLTF

01/13/2016:Notice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories FILED BY PLTF

Notice Of Hearing ON 062816 @10AM

01/06/2016:Notice Of Hearing ON 062816 @10AM

Notice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories FILED BY DANIEL E STIVLER

12/28/2015:Notice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories FILED BY DANIEL E STIVLER

Notice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories FILED BY DANIEL E STIVLER

12/28/2015:Notice Of Serving Answers To Interrogatories FILED BY DANIEL E STIVLER

Request For Production FILED BY HMT ENGINEERING, INC.

11/12/2015:Request For Production FILED BY HMT ENGINEERING, INC.

Request For Production FILED BY HMT ENGINEERING, INC.

11/12/2015:Request For Production FILED BY HMT ENGINEERING, INC.

Notice Of Appearance OBO DEF, HMT ENGINEERING INC

10/23/2015:Notice Of Appearance OBO DEF, HMT ENGINEERING INC

Summons Issued And Returned To ELISOR ON TAYLOR MORRISON SERVICES INC

10/16/2015:Summons Issued And Returned To ELISOR ON TAYLOR MORRISON SERVICES INC

Summons Issued And Returned To ELISOR ON HOSEIN TAHERI

10/16/2015:Summons Issued And Returned To ELISOR ON HOSEIN TAHERI

Civil Cover Sheet

06/22/2015:Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

06/22/2015:Civil Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketNotice Of Dismissal FILED BY PLF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder From District Court Of Appeal Dismiss Appeal 2D16-4474

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • DocketOrder FROM DCA APPELLENTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IS GRANTED, AND THE INITIAL BRIEF SHALL BE SERVED BY 03-1-2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • DocketOrder FROM DCA THE APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE IS GRANTED ONLY TO THE EXTENT THAT THE APPEALS 2D16-4474 & 2D16-4475 WILL TRAVEL TOGETHER FOR REVIEW BY THE SAME PANEL OF JUDGES. THE PARTIES SHALL FILE SEPARATE BRIEFS FOR EACH APPEAL AND, AS MAY BE NECESSARY, SEPARATE MOTIONS. THE APPELLANT'S FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED IN EACH APPEAL ARE GRANTED. THE INITIAL BRIEF AND APPENDIX IN EACH APPEAL SHALL BE SERVED BY 12-30-2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • DocketOrder FROM DCA APPELLANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IS GRANTED, AND THE INITIAL BRIEF SHALL BE SERVED BY 12/30/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketAcknowledgement OF NEW CASE FROM DCA 16-4474 NON-FINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketOrder FROM DCA FILING FEE OWED 300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketOrder FROM DCA NONFINAL APPEAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • DocketNotice Of Filing SWORN STATEMENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION FILED OBO PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Of Appearance OBO DEF, HMT ENGINEERING INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • DocketNotice Designating Email Add OBO HMT ENGINEERING INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ELISOR ON TAYLOR MORRISON SERVICES INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued And Returned To ELISOR ON HOSEIN TAHERI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • DocketAmended Complaint FILED BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • DocketCase 512015CA001929CAAXES Filed with Clerk on 6/22/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • DocketComplaint W/EXHIBIT A DEMAND JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Taylor Morrison Home Funding Inc As Successor By M is a litigant

Latest cases where MORRISON HOMES INC NOW KNOWN AS TAYLOR MORRISON SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where TAYLOR MORRISON SERVICES, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where HIGHWOODS CONTRACTING CORPORATION is a litigant