Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Pasco County Courts on 04/14/2019 at 14:51:10 (UTC).

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC VS LESCHAK, FAYTHE Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LESCHAK, FAYTHE. This case was filed in Pasco County Courts, West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court located in Pasco, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GREY, FRANK I. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXWS

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Pasco County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Pasco Judicial Center- County Court

  • County, State:

    Pasco, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GREY, FRANK I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendants

LESCHAK, FAYTHE

LESCHAK, THOMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PALMA, JORGE LUIS

 

Court Documents

Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PROCESS SERVER; 021419 AT 1000AM COURTROOM 2B

12/12/2018:Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PROCESS SERVER; 021419 AT 1000AM COURTROOM 2B

Complaint W/ATTACHMENTS

11/13/2018:Complaint W/ATTACHMENTS

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2019
  • Pre-Trial Conference Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Notice Of Appearance (LIMITED) OBO PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served 122118 THOMAS LESCHAK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Returned Served 122118 FAYTHE LESCHAK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • File Verified To This Point WM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Or Notice To Appear Issued PROCESS SERVER; 021419 AT 1000AM COURTROOM 2B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Case 512018SC004101SCAXWS Filed with Clerk on 11/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint W/ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Notice Of Confidential Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • File Verified To This Point CAF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Event Date: 02/14/2019 10:00; Judge: GREY, FRANK I; Docket Type: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: WS 2B

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crown Asset Management LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Palma, Jorge L, ESQ.